O'Blenes, Stacy Brian (CPSO#: 69651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
30 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone: (905) 836-4600
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stacy O'Blenes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. O'Blenes ( CPSO# 69651 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
30 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone Number: (905) 836-4600

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 836-4600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STACY BRIAN O'BLENES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BLENES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Sep 1995 to 02 Jan 1996
Elective Trainee - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jan 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2015