O'Brien, Brian Dermod (CPSO#: 52435)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999