O'Brien, Christopher (CPSO#: 59896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544 Ext. 2455
Fax: (519) 751-5582
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

STRATFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL
Stratford ON  N3R7X4
Canada
Phone: 519-751-5544 Ext. 2455
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1989