O'Brien, Clare Elizabeth (CPSO#: 30572)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. E. O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital, 459 Hume Street, Collingwood, ON L9Y 1W8
Date Received: 20 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015