O'Brien, Dermot Brian (CPSO#: 56445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Nov 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Phone: 905-212-9482
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dermot B O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. O'Brien ( CPSO# 56445 )

Business Address:
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 212-9482

Business Address:
2630 Rutherford Road
Suite 105
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2
Phone Number: (905) 212-9482

Medical Records Location

Address: Safe Stor Records Management Tel: 905-892-0010
Date Received: 09 Mar 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 16 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DERMOT BRIAN O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1986