O'Brien, Edward Redmond Michael (CPSO#: 61407)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2012