O'Brien, Elizabeth Philomena (CPSO#: 23996)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Etobicoke Psychiatric Consultants, Unit 103, 127 Westmore Drive, Toronto, ON M9V 3Y6
Date Received: 29 Jun 2015


Address: Attention: Margie Unit 103 127 Westmore Drive Toronto, ON M9V 3Y6
Date Received: 08 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015