O'Brien, Heather Volkert (CPSO#: 56888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: Volkert, Heather (used until: 01 Dec 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 3630
Fax: (705) 759-3651
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather V. O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. O'Brien ( CPSO# 56888 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER VOLKERT O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1988