O'Brien, Katherine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 56139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department Of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8336
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Leary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. O'Brien ( CPSO# 56139 )
Dr. G. O'Leary ( CPSO# 57549 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia UHN-MSH
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3459

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE ELIZABETH O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1986