O'Brien, Kenneth Bruce (CPSO#: 26551)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth B. O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 10 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013