O'Brien, Richard Arthur (CPSO#: 53331)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Executive Plaza III, Suite 1003
11350 McCormick Rd.
Hunt Valley MD  21031
United States
Phone: (410) 773-9601
Fax: (410) 505-4273

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - Connecticut
USA - District of Columbia
USA - Maryland
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ARTHUR O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2007