O'Brien, Simon Jonathan (CPSO#: 66990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: Meltzer, Simon Jonathan (used until: 12 Jun 2000 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care
Mental Health Services
Postal Bag 603
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613)544 4900 Ext. 53130
Fax: (613) 540-6174
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

130 Ontario Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2Y4
Canada
Phone: (613) 544 4900 Ext. 53130
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3400
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

St. Lawrence College, Campus Health
100 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7L 5A6
Canada
Phone: 613-544-5400 Ext. 1136
Fax: 613-545-3931
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. O'Brien ( CPSO# 66990 )

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
St. Lawrence College
Campus Health
100 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7L 5A6
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
130 Ontario Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2Y4
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON JONATHAN O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995