O'Byrne, Gray W L (CPSO#: 31480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 May 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1980

Summary

Former Name: O'Byrne, Wilmer Lawrence Gray (used until: 25 Feb 2008 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1865 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2C 3K6
Phone: (613) 225-5650
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gray O'Byrne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. O'Byrne ( CPSO# 31480 )
Dr. D. Manseau ( CPSO# 44059 )

Business Address:
1865 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 3K6
Phone Number: (613) 325-2905

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd., Unit 13, 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3, Tel: 1-800-775-0093.
Date Received: 06 Oct 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAY W L O'BYRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BYRNE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1980