O'Byrne, Paul Myles (CPSO#: 42833)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
HSC-2E1
Hamilton ON  L8S 1K4
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 22678
Fax: 905-546-0800
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul M. O'Byrne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. O'Byrne ( CPSO# 42833 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Health Center
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1K4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL MYLES O'BYRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BYRNE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1985