O'Connell, Emer Elizabeth Josephine (CPSO#: 61610)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Connolly Hospital
Radiology Department
Blanchardstown
Dublin 15 D15
Ireland
Phone: 01 6465717

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMER ELIZABETH JOSEPHINE O'CONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1990