O'Connell, Louis Stephen (CPSO#: 55405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1986

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greely Family Medicine Centre
1399 Ellsworth Lane (At Parkway Rd)
P O Box 67
Greely ON  K4P 1N3
Phone: (613) 821-3428
Fax: (613)821-0174
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS STEPHEN O'CONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1986

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Apr 1994
Summary:

 In April 1994, Dr. O(Connell pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of 
 an offence relevant to his suitability to practice.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea 
 and found Dr. O(Connell guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently the Committee 
 ordered:

1.	That Dr. O(Connell be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on 
 the Register.

2.	That Dr. O(Connell be fined the sum of $5000.00 within thirty days from the date 
 of the hearing.

3.	That Dr. O(Connell(s licence to practice be suspended for a period of 180 
 days;

4.	That 120 days of this suspension were themselves to be suspended on the condition 
 that:

(i)	Dr. O(Connell provide satisfactory proof to the Registrar that he had paid the 
 fine;

(ii)	Dr. O(Connell pay to the College the sum of $5000.00 as the costs of this prosecution 
 within thirty days of the date of the hearing;

(iii)	Dr. O(Connell perform 45 hours of community 
 service at an AIDS hospice, and file with the Registrar satisfactory proof that he had performed 
 such service;

5.	That the suspension of Dr. O(Connell was to commence on a date to be fixed by 
 the Registrar within sixty days from the date of the hearing.  Provided that the above conditions 
 were satisfied, the suspension was to be sixty days in length, served on sixty consecutive days.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 07, 1994