O'Connell, Sarah Hope (CPSO#: 100636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Blowers, Sarah Hope (used until: 19 Apr 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1B9
Phone: (705) 549-3939
Fax: 705 549 0029
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH HOPE O'CONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015