O'Connor, Brendan Dominic (CPSO#: 30528)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2004