O'Connor, Catherine Shirley (CPSO#: 56953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: O'Connor-Moll, Catherine Shirley (used until: 17 Nov 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gloucester Family Medical Centre
Unit 144B
1980 Ogilvie Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9L3
Phone: (613) 746-8559
Fax: (613) 563-2211
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE SHIRLEY O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006