O'Connor, Denis Peter Claver (CPSO#: 23945)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 May 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:National University of Ireland, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Sep 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 May 2005

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Jul 1997
Summary:

 In July 1997, the Discipline Committee found Dr. O(Connor guilty of professional misconduct as 
 defined in Ontario Regulations 448/80, and Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he 
 failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27.21 and 29.22; and 
 that he failed to maintain the records that are required to be kept respecting a member(s 
 patients, contrary to s. 27.3 and 29.3, respectively.

The Committee considered the joint 
 submission of counsel and ordered the following penalty:

1)	That Dr. O(Connor be reprimanded, 
 with the fact of the reprimand to be recordedin the Register;

2)	That Dr. O(Connor complete the 
 College(s Medical record-keeping course for physicians in March 1998 and provide satisfactory 
 evidence to the Registrar of having done so.  In the event that satisfactory proof is not provided 
 to the Registrar by March 30, 1998, the Committee orders that Dr. O(Connor(s certificate of 
 registration be suspended until such time as Dr. O(Connor completes the course and provides 
 satisfactory evidence to the Registrar that he has done so; and

3)	That Dr. O(Connor complete the 
 CPSO(s Physician-Patient Communication and Interviewing Skills Course by June 30, 1999 and furnish 
 satisfactory proof thereof to the Registrar.  In the event that such proof is not provided to the 
 Registrar by June 30, 1999, the Committee orders that Dr. O(Connor(s certificate of registration 
 be suspended until such time as Dr. O(Connor completes the course and provides satisfactory 
 evidence to the Registrar that he has done so.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 05, 1998