O'Connor, Joseph (CPSO#: 30271)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Soldier's Memorial Hospital, 170 Colborne Street West, Orillia, ON, L3V 2Z3
Date Received: 05 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016