O'Connor, Kevin Patrick (CPSO#: 72515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mindemoya Medical Center
2120 B
Highway 551
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone: (705) 377-5311
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stadnyk Jeeves Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Harelnikava ( CPSO# 99499 )
Dr. N. Jeeves ( CPSO# 62587 )
Dr. A. Stadnyk ( CPSO# 33598 )
Dr. M. Al Hadi ( CPSO# 84378 )
Dr. K. O'Connor ( CPSO# 72515 )
Dr. M. Reade ( CPSO# 77096 )

Business Address:
2120B Highway 551
P.O. Box 150
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 377-5371

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site Mindemoya

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN PATRICK O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2000