O'Connor, Richard James Anthony (CPSO#: 28584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 411
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-2133
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RJA O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. O'Connor ( CPSO# 28584 )

Business Address:
411 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 820-2133

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JAMES ANTHONY O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1976