O'Connor, Terence Markham (CPSO#: 79958)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2003 to 27 Oct 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 28 Oct 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004