O'Connor, Thomas Christopher (CPSO#: 60993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7663
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS CHRISTOPHER O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1990