O'Connor, Timothy Michael (CPSO#: 75091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Winchester District Memorial Hospit
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2420
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.M. O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. O'Connor ( CPSO# 75091 )

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 29 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY MICHAEL O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 21 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2003