O'Donnell, Denis Eunin Mary (CPSO#: 60408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Nov 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Richardson House
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 548-2339
Fax: (613) 549-1459
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Donnell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. O'Donnell ( CPSO# 60601 )
Dr. D. O'Donnell ( CPSO# 60408 )

Business Address:
Richardson House
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 548-2339

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENIS EUNIN MARY O'DONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'DONNELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1989