O'Donnell, Trishia Joyce (CPSO#: 84796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree York Lanes
Student Health Centre
York University
4700 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 1P3
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 736-5523
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

12-419 Dundas St. East
Waterdown ON  L8B 0K4
Canada
Phone: 9056892655
Fax: 9056894673
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRISHIA JOYCE O'DONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'DONNELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008