O'Donoghue, John Paul (CPSO#: 58488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Department of Nuclear Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411 Ext. 33258
Fax: (519) 973-4667
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Nuclear Medicine
Leamington District Memorial Hosp
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Precision Diagnostic Imaging
Unit 136
Windsor Professional Centre
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Canada
Phone: (518) 254-4555
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

WRA Clinics
13728 Tecumseh Rd. E.
Unit 10
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Canada
Phone: (519) 979-0111
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52266
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul O'Donoghue Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. O'Donoghue ( CPSO# 58488 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hopspital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
136 - 2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4417

Business Address:
Erie Shores Health Care
Nuclear Medicine
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 326-2373

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL O'DONOGHUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'DONOGHUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1988