O'Driscoll, Jennifer Ashley (CPSO#: 95185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Khu, Jennifer Ashley (used until: 03 Feb 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: 5199412410
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

222 Lansdowne Ave
Toronto ON  M6K3C6
Canada
Phone: 647 7256555
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ASHLEY O'DRISCOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'DRISCOLL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013