O'Driscoll, Martha Ann (CPSO#: 53241)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bercovici Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Records Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 26 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2015