O'Driscoll, Shawn William (CPSO#: 32480)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 31 Dec 1984
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1985 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2004