O'Flanagan, Denis John (CPSO#: 30348)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone: (519) 246-9985
Fax: (519) 246-9765
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Flanagan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. O'Flanagan ( CPSO# 30348 )

Business Address:
Strathroy Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 246-9985

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENIS JOHN O'FLANAGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'FLANAGAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1978