O'Gorman, Augustine Michael (CPSO#: 23017)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:National University of Ireland, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 15 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Oct 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2008