O'Halloran, Patrick Joseph (CPSO#: 27482)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick J. O'Halloran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093 www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 04 Jan 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Feb 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jan 2016