Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

O'Hanlon, Jacinta Sarah Mary (CPSO#: 51304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
93 Dewbourne Avenue
Toronto ON  M6C 1Y4
Phone: (416) 789-2806
Fax: (416) 784-3352
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACINTA SARAH MARY O'HANLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'HANLON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1984