O'Hayon, Bonnie Bracha Esther (CPSO#: 73975)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1333 Shepphard Avenue E
ste 125
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-8800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bonnie O'Hayon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. O'Hayon ( CPSO# 73975 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 494-8800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BONNIE BRACHA ESTHER O'HAYON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'HAYON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 04 Nov 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 05 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2005