O'Keeffe, Michael Ezra (CPSO#: 110472)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2017

Expiry Date:  31 May 2024

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Department of Medical Imaging
203 McCaul Street, 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 1W7
Phone: (416) 978-0513
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ferco H. Berger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. O'Keeffe ( CPSO# 110472)
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue
Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone Number: (416) 978-0976

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2016 to 31 May 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2024

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Michael Ezra O'Keeffe may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,University of Toronto, in which Dr. O'Keeffe holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. O'Keeffe no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. O'Keeffe's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. O'Keeffe's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June 1, 2017.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on May 31, 2024.