O'Kelly, Cian James (CPSO#: 76286)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010