O'Leary, Gerald Martin (CPSO#: 57549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Anaesthesia UHN-MSH
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3459
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Leary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. O'Brien ( CPSO# 56139 )
Dr. G. O'Leary ( CPSO# 57549 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia UHN-MSH
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3459

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALD MARTIN O'LEARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'LEARY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1986
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Feb 1994