O'Malley, Frances Philomena (CPSO#: 60207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 62025
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCES PHILOMENA O'MALLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'MALLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991