O'Malley, Maureen Patricia (CPSO#: 66407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
34 Stone Church Road West
Ancaster ON  L9K 1S4
Phone: (905) 304-1122
Fax: (905) 304-3768
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Canada
Phone: (905) 336-9624
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.S. Nash and M.P. O'Malley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. O'Malley ( CPSO# 66407 )
Dr. W. Nash ( CPSO# 66405 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
107 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone Number: (905) 627-3505

Business Address:
Suite 200
34 Stone Church Road West
Ancaster ON  L9K 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 304-1122

Business Address:
Suite 8-9
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 336-9624

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAUREEN PATRICIA O'MALLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'MALLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997