O'Maonaigh, Conleith Eamonn (CPSO#: 56470)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic, Spanish

Education:University of Dublin, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005