O'Meara, Aisling Judith (CPSO#: 93681)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Program of Laboratory Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 26 Aug 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AISLING JUDITH O'MEARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'MEARA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 21 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 21 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2016