O'Meara, Paloma Clare (CPSO#: 89426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of General Internal Med
P O Box 209
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 77137
Fax: (613) 737-8688
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. O'Meara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. O'Meara ( CPSO# 89426 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Box 209
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PALOMA CLARE O'MEARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'MEARA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 03 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 04 Apr 2010 to 03 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 04 Apr 2011 to 03 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 04 Apr 2012 to 03 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 04 Apr 2013 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2014