O'Neill, Anne Catherine (CPSO#: 96439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2013

Expiry Date:  12 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Feb 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Plastic Surgery
200 Elizabeth Street Room 8N 867
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3143
Fax: (416) 340-4403
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Catherine O'Neill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. O'Neill ( CPSO# 96439 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Plastic Surgery
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 8N 867 Eaton Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3143

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 04 Feb 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Feb 2013
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Dec 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Anne Catherine O'Neill may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division of Plastic and Reconstructive Surgery, University of
                        Toronto, in which Dr. O'Neill holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. O'Neill  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. O'Neill's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. O'Neill's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on February 4, 2013, and currently has an
                  interim expiry date of January 12, 2019.  The expiry date of this
                  certificate may be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2
                  and 3 above.