O'Neill, Blair Joseph (CPSO#: 56550)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 28 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992