O'Neill, Donna Marie (CPSO#: 53862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
214 North Elm Avenue
Jackson MI  49202
United States
Phone: (517) 788-4781
Fax: (517) 788-4799

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 01 Dec 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA MARIE O'NEILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'NEILL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 14 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1985