O'Neill, Ira Timothy Johnson (CPSO#: 16229)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1957
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 22 Apr 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1964
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Dec 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1996