O'Reilly, Elaine Michele (CPSO#: 87199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montebello Medical Centre
118 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5Y1
Phone: (905) 685-6555
Fax: (905) 685-6558
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

mount carmel home
78 yates st
St Catharines ON  L2R 5R9
Canada
Phone: (905) 685-9155
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Tabor Manor
1 Tabor Dr.
St Catharines ON  L2N 1V9
Canada
Phone: (905) 934-2548
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Schmon Health Centre
Ridley College
2 Ridley Road
St Catharines ON  L2R 7C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 684-1889 Ext. 2318
Fax: (905) 682-7762
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Reilly & Greenway Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Greenway ( CPSO# 87825 )
Dr. E. O'Reilly ( CPSO# 87199 )

Business Address:
Montebello Medical Centre
8 - 118 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5Y1
Phone Number: (905) 685-6555

Business Address:
78 Yates Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5R9
Phone Number: (905) 685-9155

Business Address:
1 Tabor Drive
St Catharines ON  L2N 1V9
Phone Number: (905) 934-2548

Business Address:
Ridley College
2 Ridley Road
St Catharines ON  L2R 7C3
Phone Number: (905) 684-1889

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE MICHELE O'REILLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'REILLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2008